MD SB777 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the property tax under certain circumstances dwelling houses owned by certain disabled active duty service members; requiring a disabled active duty service member to apply for the exemption and provide to the supervisor of assessments for a county a certain certification of disability; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to authorize, by law, a refund to a disabled active duty service member under certain circumstances; applying the Act to tax years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Exemption for Dwelling House Owned by Disabled Active Duty Service Member
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {569830/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Counties
Disabilities
Exemptions
Housing
Interest
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Spouses
Taxes - Property
Counties
Disabilities
Exemptions
Housing
Interest
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Spouses
Taxes - Property