MD SB777 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting from the property tax under certain circumstances dwelling houses owned by certain disabled active duty service members; requiring a disabled active duty service member to apply for the exemption and provide to the supervisor of assessments for a county a certain certification of disability; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to authorize, by law, a refund to a disabled active duty service member under certain circumstances; applying the Act to tax years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax - Exemption for Dwelling House Owned by Disabled Active Duty Service Member

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-14HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {569830/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback