MD SB775 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court that approves an arrangement for custody or visitation with a party who has committed abuse against the other parent of the party's child, the party's spouse, or any child residing within the party's household, to impose certain conditions on the custody arrangement; creating a rebuttable presumption that it is not in the best interest of a child for a court to grant custody to a party who has committed abuse against certain individuals; etc.
Title
Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Abuse
Alcoholic Beverages
Bonds
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Custody
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Parents and Guardians
Alcoholic Beverages
Bonds
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Custody
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Parents and Guardians
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 9 | 101.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |