MD SB775 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defining "taxpayer" as the owner of residential or commercial property who purchases and installs an energy storage system or an individual that owns or pays for the installation of an energy storage system that supplies energy for use on a residential or commercial property; providing a credit against the State income tax for the costs of installing an energy storage system; increasing from $75,000 to $150,000 the maximum tax credit certificate that may be issued for the installation of an energy storage system on certain property; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-10SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB980 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10719(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback