MD SB773 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, from 20% to 25%, the percentage of an expert's professional activities that may have been devoted to certain activities that directly involve testimony in personal injury claims during the 12 months immediately before the date when the claim was first filed in order for the expert to qualify to testify in relation to a certain proceeding; establishing that a certain health care provider shall be deemed to have met a certain requirement during the pendency of a claim under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Qualification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {338570/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Courts
Evidence
Health Occupations
Medical Malpractice
Salaries and Compensation
Witnesses
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Courts
Evidence
Health Occupations
Medical Malpractice
Salaries and Compensation
Witnesses