MD SB769 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain venison donation programs to report the name and home address of each donor who intended to claim the income tax credit and the number of deer donated by each donor who intended to claim the income tax credit to the Comptroller by January 31 each year; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021, on testing of deer brought to deer processors for chronic wasting disease; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Reporting Requirement and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2021-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {835761/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Floor Amendment {533421/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Favorable |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1017 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Subjects
Food
Hunting and Fishing
Income Tax
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Hunting and Fishing
Income Tax
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Tax - General | 10 | 746 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |