MD SB768 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, on or before October 1, 2021, minimum mandatory standards for inmate food services to comply with certain health and wellness standards adopted by the Secretary of Health; requiring certain training standards adopted by the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to include certain standards for health care workers; requiring the Secretary of Health to adopt dietary standards for certain health facilities on or before October 1, 2021, that comply with certain health and wellness standards; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB819 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Correctional Services8103(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General19308(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General211301(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General211302(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback