MD SB765 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing certain requirements that a person be a resident for a certain period of time to be issued certain statewide alcoholic beverages licenses and permits; requiring certain partners to remain residents for the duration of time that a certain license is in effect; repealing from certain local alcoholic beverages licenses certain durational residency requirements; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Durational Residency Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {674538/1 Adopted
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB902 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 462

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages12102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121405(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages13102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages131403(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages14102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages141704(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages19102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages191402(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages2125(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages2211(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages20102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages201404(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages21102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages211401(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages211405.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages22102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages221402(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages23102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages231404(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages231406(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages251011.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages25102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages251405(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages251406(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages26102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages261405(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages261406(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages261704(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages261808(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages262102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages27102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages271402(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages271403(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages28102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages281409(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages3102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages3104(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages3105(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages3106(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages31102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages311312(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages311402(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages32102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages321403(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages321405(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages321502(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages321503(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages4103(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages4104(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages4105(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages4109(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback