MD SB760 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an individual who provides security guard services to the individual's employer to be certified as a security guard, subject to a certain exception; regulating certain security guard employers; altering the certification and renewal standards for security guards; requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to identify or establish certain training programs for the certification and renewal of certification of security guards; requiring security guards to complete certain security training programs; etc.
Title
Security Guard Agencies, Security Guard Employers, and Security Guards – Standards and Certifications
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 763 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-34) |
2023-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {963725/1 Adopted |
2023-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {633221/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1055 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Arrests
Business Occupations and Professions
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Demographics
Disabilities
Fees
Fingerprinting
Guns
Insurance
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Liability
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Police Conduct
Safety
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Business Occupations and Professions
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Demographics
Disabilities
Fees
Fingerprinting
Guns
Insurance
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Liability
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Police Conduct
Safety
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 19 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 19 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 19 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 19 | 404.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 19 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 19 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 19 | 412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 19 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 19 | 414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 19 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |