MD SB760 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the governing body of Frederick County to grant a property tax setoff to a municipal corporation in specified minimum amounts for specified taxable years.
Title
Frederick County - Property Tax Setoff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-09 - House - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Branch) Adopted (Y: 124 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-09 - House - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Branch) Adopted (Y: 124 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (121-1) | |
2011-04-09 | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Branch) Adopted (124-5) | |
2011-04-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-20 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-18 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |