MD SB759 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to protect State residents, State and local governments, commercial health plans, health care providers, pharmacies licensed in the State, and other stakeholders within the health care system from the high costs of prescription drug products; providing for the membership of the Board and the disclosure of certain conflicts of interest; requiring the Board to identify certain prescription drug products with certain costs; etc.
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {367572/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Advertising
Appeals
Assessments
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Drugs
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Labeling
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Minorities
Notices
Open Government
Patients
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
Tax Returns
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Treasurers
Voting
Weights and Measures
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment
Appeals
Assessments
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Drugs
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Labeling
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Minorities
Notices
Open Government
Patients
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
Tax Returns
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Treasurers
Voting
Weights and Measures
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment