MD SB759 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to protect State residents, State and local governments, commercial health plans, health care providers, pharmacies licensed in the State, and other stakeholders within the health care system from the high costs of prescription drug products; providing for the membership of the Board and the disclosure of certain conflicts of interest; requiring the Board to identify certain prescription drug products with certain costs; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-04-06HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-04-06HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {367572/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects

Advertising
Appeals
Assessments
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Drugs
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Labeling
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Minorities
Notices
Open Government
Patients
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
Tax Returns
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Treasurers
Voting
Weights and Measures
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback