MD SB756 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a public general law may not be construed to limit a power or function of a local government unless the public general law specifically states that it limits concurrent jurisdiction or that the State's jurisdiction is exclusive; providing for the construction of the Act; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Provisions - Public General Law - Preemption of Local Laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
2020-03-03SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-05SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB1522 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions1404(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback