MD SB755 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that an entity operating a school bus under a contract with the Harford County Board of Education to provide student transportation services may not be held liable beyond the limits of the entity's insurance coverage under the contract with the Harford County Board of Education through the Maryland Association of Boards of Education in any suit that arises from a vehicular accident or an act or omission of an officer, a director, or an employee of the entity except under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Harford County - Liability of School Bus Contractors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseReferred Ways and Means
2020-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {974731/1 Adopted
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7810(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback