MD SB751 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "eligible apprentice" for purposes of a certain credit against the State income tax for the employment of certain eligible apprentices to include certain individuals employed through a youth apprenticeship program; prohibiting a taxpayer from claiming the credit for more than five eligible apprentices in a taxable year; altering the amount of the credit to $3,000 for certain apprentices; altering the maximum amount of credits that may be approved in the aggregate each year to $15,000 per taxpayer; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Apprenticeship Start-Up Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
2020-03-18SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (132-1)
2020-03-17HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (132-1)
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {775769/1 Adopted
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-03-15HouseReferred Ways and Means
2020-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {889238/1 Adopted
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-02-10SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-10SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB1457 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2017(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10742(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback