MD SB746 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing collective bargaining rights for certain community college employees; establishing procedures for the selection and certification of an exclusive bargaining representative; establishing a cap of four on the number of bargaining units in each community college; requiring certain contracts and agreements entered into before September 1, 2022, to remain in effect until the agreement or contract expires; requiring the Governor to include certain amounts in the annual budget bill for Baltimore City Community College; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-02SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (94-41)
2021-03-31HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-30HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2021-03-20HouseReferred Appropriations
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (31-14)
2021-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Adopted (32-15)
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {737975/1
2021-03-17SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2021-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {737975/1
2021-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2021-02-11SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-05SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB894 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education16403(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16412(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16414.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16701(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16702(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16703(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16704(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16705(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16706(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16707(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16708(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16709(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16710(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16711(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16712(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16713(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16714(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16715(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions32A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions32A-05(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions32A-07(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions32A-08(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback