MD SB746 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, subject to specified exceptions, a District Court Commissioner may be a resident of a county contiguous to the county in which the commissioner serves.
Title
District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-2) (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-15) (Y: 124 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-15) (Y: 124 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-2) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-15) |
2017-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment {933224/5 (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment {543520/1 (Delegate McCray) Withdrawn |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {632319/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {913526/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {913526/1 (Senator Ferguson) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |