MD SB744 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Planning to provide a list of excess real property owned by the State to the Department of Housing and Community Development; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to determine whether any of the listed properties are suitable for use or redevelopment as affordable housing; establishing the Rental Housing Fund; requiring the Comptroller to distribute $30,000,000 of income tax revenue from individuals to the Rental Housing Fund on or before June 30, 2022; etc.
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2022-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {693028/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Floor Amendment {683428/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {393924/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB927 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Comptroller
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Income Tax
Leases and Rent
Loans
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Planning, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Treasurers
Utilities
Comptroller
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Income Tax
Leases and Rent
Loans
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Planning, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Treasurers
Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 5 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 2 | 605.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |