MD SB744 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of alternates that the State Board of Nursing is required to appoint for certain members of the Certified Nursing Assistant Advisory Committee; establishing certain qualifications for members of the advisory committee; prohibiting a member of the advisory committee from serving more than 2 consecutive full terms; requiring the State Board to fill a certain vacancy within 60 days after the date of the vacancy, to the extent practicable; altering the meeting requirements for the advisory committee; etc.
Title
State Board of Nursing - Certified Nursing Assistant Advisory Committee - Membership and Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 465 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health Occupations
meetings
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Residency
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Health Occupations
meetings
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Residency
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 8 | 6A-13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |