MD SB744 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland to develop a comprehensive siting blueprint to guide units of State and local government in evaluating proposed solar energy projects, consistent with the Commission's findings and recommendations; requiring the Commission to take certain actions in carrying out its work; requiring the Commission to submit a certain report and blueprint to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {444335/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-06SenateLaid Over (Senator Feldman) Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {444335/1
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback