MD SB744 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 to provide that specified grants for the Water Park at Bohrer Park may not terminate before June 1, 2016; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Montgomery County - Water Park at Bohrer Park

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-9) (Y: 126 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196
2015-04-13SenateReturned Passed
2015-04-13HouseThird Reading Passed (126-9)
2015-04-11HouseSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-11HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-11HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2015-03-25HouseHearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-06HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2015-03-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2015-03-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-03-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-03-02SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2015-02-25SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-17SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2015-02-13SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback