MD SB743 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the State Board of Elections from approving a contract with an election service provider unless the contract includes a clause regarding notice of ownership of, investment in, or control of the election service provider by a foreign national; authorizing the State Administrator of Elections to terminate the contract with an election service provider on the making of a certain determination; requiring the Administrator to provide notice in writing of the termination and the reasons for terminating the contract; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-12) (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (104-29) (Y: 104 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-5) (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (32-12)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (104-29)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {895662/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-11HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (41-5)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0743&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0743f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0743t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0743e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_403_sb0743e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0743_89566201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0743.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0743_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0422.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0743_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1372.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1346.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback