MD SB742 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB759
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Elections, in collaboration with the local boards of elections, to conduct a risk-limiting audit after each statewide election; authorizing, rather than requiring, the State Board, in collaboration with the local boards, to conduct an automated software audit after a statewide election; and requiring the State Board, in collaboration with certain local boards, to conduct pilot risk-limiting audits after the November 2022 statewide general election.
Title
Election Law – Postelection Tabulation Audits – Risk–Limiting Audits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB745 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-18 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB759 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
HB759 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Equipment
internet
Records
Reports
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Equipment
internet
Records
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 11 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0742?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0742f.pdf |