MD SB741 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the process by which a person who is denied a certain handgun permit or renewal of a permit or whose permit is revoked or limited by the Secretary of State Police or the Secretary's designee may appeal the decision; providing that appeals from a certain decision by the Secretary or the Secretary's designee may be made to the Handgun Permit Review Board; requiring the Board to review a certain record and hold a hearing within 60 days of the last hearing; requiring the Board to report annually to the Governor and General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-22) (Y: 116 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (115-22)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2018-04-04HouseHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-30HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2018-03-27HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (46-1)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments {698976/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-22SenateHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback