MD SB740 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland COVID-19 Small Business Grant Program in the Department of Commerce to provide funding to counties for emergency relief during calendar years 2021 and 2022 for small businesses that have experienced at least a 25% reduction in gross receipts during the pandemic; authorizing a county to apply to the Department for a distribution of funds; authorizing a county to designate a county entity to receive and distribute the funds; authorizing a county to establish certain eligibility and application requirements; etc.
Title
Economic Development - COVID-19 Small Business Grant Program (COVID-19 Crisis Small Business Survival Program Act of 2021)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {557671/1 Adopted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Commerce, Department of
Counties
COVID-19
Economic and Community Development
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Grants
Insurance
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Unemployment
Counties
COVID-19
Economic and Community Development
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Grants
Insurance
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Unemployment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |