MD SB74 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to $146,500 the maximum salary that the Board of Public Works may set for a clerk of a circuit court.
Title
Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-30) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-4) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB519 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Subjects
Clerks of Court
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Public Works, Board of
Salaries and Compensation
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Public Works, Board of
Salaries and Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |