MD SB738 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a State policy that local school systems operate their school library media programs consistent with certain standards; requiring each local school system to develop a policy and procedures to review objections to materials in a school library media program; prohibiting a county board of education from dismissing, demoting, suspending, disciplining, reassigning, transferring, or otherwise retaliating against certain school library media program personnel for performing their job duties consistent with certain standards; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freedom to Read Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Floor Amendment 863729/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 13 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Floor Amendment 273022/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 12 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130
2024-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2024-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (31-11)
2024-04-05SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2024-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (101-38)
2024-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2024-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {223027/1 Adopted
2024-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2024-03-27HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2024-03-27HouseHearing canceled
2024-03-16HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2024-03-15HouseReferred Ways and Means
2024-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (36-10)
2024-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2024-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {863729/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (13-32)
2024-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {273022/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (12-33)
2024-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {173028/1 Adopted
2024-03-08SenateMotion Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Ready) Adopted
2024-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {173028/1
2024-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
2024-02-09SenateHearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m.
2024-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment

Same As/Similar To

HB785 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education23101(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23102.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23105(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23106(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23202(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23202.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23205(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23406(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23503(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23506(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23507(n/a)See Bill Text
Education4142(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0738?ys=2024RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0738f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0738t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0738e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/Chapters_noln/CH_130_sb0738e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0738_17302801.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0738_27302201.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0738_86372901.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0738_22302701.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/votes_comm/sb0738_eee.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/votes_comm/sb0738_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/votes/Senate/0480.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/votes/Senate/0481.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/votes/Senate/0590.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/votes/House/1285.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/votes/Senate/1237.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback