MD SB737 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a person who is not a certain licensee may not complete the sale of a certain rifle or shotgun, except under certain circumstances; requiring, before a certain sale is conducted, the seller and purchaser to meet jointly with a certain licensee and request that the licensee facilitate the sale; requiring a licensee to take certain actions when facilitating a sale; exempting a certain person from a certain background check under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, Transfers, and Loans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {173428/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {273520/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2019-04-08HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (32-14)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {333823/3 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-04-05SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {273520/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-30)
2019-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {173428/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-30)
2019-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {593529/1 (Senator Bailey) Withdrawn
2019-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {773526/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {748674/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0737?ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0737f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0737t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0737_17342801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0737_27352001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0737_59352901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0737_74867401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0737_77352601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0737_33382303.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0737.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0737_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1213.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1214.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1263.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback