MD SB735 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a cash balance plan under the State Retirement and Pension System; providing that certain individuals are not eligible to participate in the Employees' Pension System or the Teachers' Pension System if they elect to participate in the cash balance plan; providing that certain individuals are not eligible to participate in the optional retirement program if they elect to participate in the cash balance plan; authorizing participation in the cash balance plan for certain individuals hired on or after July 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18SenateHearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-02-18SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback