MD SB731 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the representatives of specified employees in the Division of Emergency Medical Services to bargain collectively with the County Commissioners on issues; authorizing the County Commissioners to recognize or withdraw recognition of an exclusive representative under specified circumstances; providing for the subject of, the time frame of, the rules of conduct for, and a process and remedies for violations of the collective bargaining agreement; etc.
Title
Cecil County - Emergency Medical Services - Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (110-27) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-21 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (44-3) | |
2010-03-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Arbitration
Cecil County
Collective Bargaining
County Commissioners
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Public Employees
Strikes
Unions
Cecil County
Collective Bargaining
County Commissioners
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Public Employees
Strikes
Unions