MD SB728 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 378
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 378
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health to establish through regulations a provision requiring an ambulatory surgical facility to ensure that an anesthesia practitioner is not precluded from providing the highest level of anesthesia support that may be required to safely treat patients undergoing procedures in a freestanding ambulatory surgical facility performed in a nonsterile procedure room or a sterile operating room.
Title
Health Facilities - Freestanding Ambulatory Care Facilities - Administration of Anesthesia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 378 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {817770/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB935 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 377
Subjects
Communications
Drugs
Equipment
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Safety
Drugs
Equipment
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 3B-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |