MD SB728 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from selling a battery operated smoke alarm in the State for a certain purpose on or after October 1, 2018, unless the smoke alarm is a sealed, tamper resistant unit incorporating a silence/hush button and using one or more long-life batteries; exempting certain alarms and detectors from a certain prohibition; defining "long-life battery"; and imposing a fine of up to $1,000 for a violation of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-11) (Y: 122 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (121-11)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {290118/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-04-03HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {688479/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-07SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0728&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0728f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0728t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0728e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_484_sb0728e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0728_68847901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0728_29011801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0728.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0728_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0680.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0728_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1270.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1387.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback