MD SB727 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the exemption from the Maryland Healthy Working Families Act for certain on-call employees; requiring employers to allow employees to use earned sick and safe leave during a public health emergency; requiring certain employers to provide employees certain earned sick and safe leave on the date that a public health emergency is declared or proclaimed for a jurisdiction; requiring an employer to provide certain earned sick and safe leave regardless of the employee's length of employment with the employer; etc.
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Revisions and Public Health Emergency Leave
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1326 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Age
Agriculture
Child Care
Contractors
Diseases
Domestic Partnerships and Civil Unions
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Health
Labor and Industry, Division of
Language
Leave
Local Government Mandates
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Officials
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
Spouses
Time
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Agriculture
Child Care
Contractors
Diseases
Domestic Partnerships and Civil Unions
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Health
Labor and Industry, Division of
Language
Leave
Local Government Mandates
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Officials
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
Spouses
Time
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0727?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0727f.pdf |