MD SB725 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting specified cross-references to the Alcoholic Beverages Article in the Annotated Code of Maryland; and correcting specified errors in the Alcoholic Beverages Article.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228 |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2016-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {913094/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {634232/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annotated Code of Maryland
Blue Laws
Codes
Commerce and Business
Corrective Legislation
Counties
Fees
Industry and Technology
Interest
Licenses
Limited Liability Companies
Municipal Corporations
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annotated Code of Maryland
Blue Laws
Codes
Commerce and Business
Corrective Legislation
Counties
Fees
Industry and Technology
Interest
Licenses
Limited Liability Companies
Municipal Corporations
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes