MD SB724 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the process by which a health insurance carrier is required to provide notice of an adverse decision in nonemergency cases under the internal grievance process established by the carrier for its members.
Title
Health Insurance Carriers - Requirements for Internal Grievance Process - Modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Communications
Electronic Communication
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Notices
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Electronic Communication
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Notices
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones