MD SB723 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Food System Resiliency Council; providing that the goals of the Council are to address the food insecurity crisis in the State due to the pandemic, develop recommendations to increase the long-term resiliency of the food system, and develop by November 1, 2021, a plan to increase the production and procurement of Maryland certified food; requiring the Council to submit an interim report by November 1, 2021, and recommendations on a statewide food policy council to the General Assembly by November 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-36) |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-30 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {844331/1 Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB831 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 724
Subjects
Agriculture
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
COVID-19
Emergency Bills
Federal Aid
Food
Grants
Maryland Emergency Management Agency
Poverty
Public Safety
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
COVID-19
Emergency Bills
Federal Aid
Food
Grants
Maryland Emergency Management Agency
Poverty
Public Safety
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 14 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |