MD SB722 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program to include loans for environmental remediation projects intended to remove environmental or health hazards and for resiliency projects to increase the capacity of a structure or infrastructure to withstand the effects of climate change; adding environmental remediation and resiliency projects to the items requiring eligibility requirements under a certain ordinance; requiring that certain loan terms include a provision requiring that a loan be repaid over a certain term; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy Loan Program - Environmental Remediation and Resiliency Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2020-03-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {434739/1 Adopted
2020-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Local Government11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11103(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback