MD SB72 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the membership of the State Advisory Board for the Department of Juvenile Services; and requiring certain members appointed to the Board from the general public to meet certain requirements to include one that shall be a victim advocate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 270
2019-04-03SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-03-20HouseHearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-03-20HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-11HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-01-31SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-01-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-01-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {408170/1 Report Adopted
2019-01-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-09SenateHearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-09-26SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback