MD SB715 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that a certain golf course have average daily receipts from the sale of food that exceed the average daily receipts from the sale of alcoholic beverages to be issued a certain Class B beer, wine, and liquor license by the Board of License Commissioners for Wicomico County; and authorizing the holder of a Class A beer, wine, and liquor license to sell alcoholic beverages on Sundays.
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 550 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {704231/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB795 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 549
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Fees
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Time
Wicomico County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Fees
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Time
Wicomico County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 32 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 32 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 32 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |