MD SB715 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Affordable Housing Development Credit Program within the Division of Development Finance of the Department of Housing and Community Development to provide certain owners of certain low-income housing projects certain tax credits for a certain number of years; authorizing an owner or a developer of a low-income housing project to submit a certain application to the Department to enroll in the Program on or after July 1, 2020, but before July 1, 2023; etc.
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1567 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Business Trusts
Certifications
Corporations
Economic and Community Development
Financial Institutions
Franchise Tax
Governor
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Income Tax
Insurance
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Poverty
Property Developers
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Budgets
Business Trusts
Certifications
Corporations
Economic and Community Development
Financial Institutions
Franchise Tax
Governor
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Income Tax
Insurance
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Poverty
Property Developers
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 751 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0715?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0715f.pdf |