MD SB715 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Power Plant Research Program to conduct a study of regulatory reforms and market incentives that may be necessary or beneficial to increase the use of energy storage devices in the State; requiring the Program to consult with specified entities and interests in conducting the study; prohibiting the cost of the study from exceeding $125,000 per fiscal year; requiring the Program to make its final report and recommend policy actions to specified Committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {397673/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
Environmental Health
Equipment
Industry and Technology
Municipal Corporations
Power Plants
Prices
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
Environmental Health
Equipment
Industry and Technology
Municipal Corporations
Power Plants
Prices
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Utility Regulation