MD SB711 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a constituent institution of the University of Maryland to remove, suspend, or demote a regular full-time or part-time employee who is represented by an exclusive representative under certain provisions of law and who is not on probation only in accordance with certain provisions of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-33) (Y: 105 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (105-33)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-04-04HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-04-03HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {977278/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback