MD SB709 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder and Traumatic Brain Injury Alternative Therapies Fund to support the study of the effectiveness of and improving access to alternative therapies for post-traumatic stress disorder and traumatic brain injuries in veterans; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the appropriate uses of and findings and recommendations from studies funded by the Fund; etc.
Title
Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder and Traumatic Brain Injury Alternative Therapies Fund - Establishment (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-29 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {183824/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1367 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed Forces
Communications
Drugs
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Armed Forces
Communications
Drugs
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 24 | 1801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |