MD SB709 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Declaring the intent of the General Assembly that homeowners have access to certain affordability programs for water and sewer services; authorizing a political subdivision, a sanitary commission, or an authority to develop and implement certain affordability programs; authorizing a sanitary commission, a political subdivision, or an authority to disconnect certain service to properties that meet certain criteria; etc.
Title
Environment - Water and Sewer Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Assessments
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Fees
General Assembly
Housing
Notices
Prices
Real Property
Sewage
Water
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Fees
General Assembly
Housing
Notices
Prices
Real Property
Sewage
Water