MD SB706 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to require a specified applicant to conduct and submit to the Department a cumulative impact assessment before the Department prepares a tentative determination on a specified permit application; requiring a cumulative impact assessment to address the likely impact on the environment and on human populations that will result from specified incremental impacts; authorizing the Department to adopt regulations necessary to implement the Act; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Environmental Matters |
2014-03-25 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-3) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {234936/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Assessments
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Nuclear Matters
Pollution
Prince George's County
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Water
Zoning and Planning
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Nuclear Matters
Pollution
Prince George's County
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Water
Zoning and Planning