MD SB706 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to suspend the retirement benefit of a retiree of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System who is elected as a sheriff within 1 year after retirement; providing for the reinstatement of a benefit; providing that a suspension of a benefit does not affect survivor benefits; and applying the Act only to any individual who retires after July 1, 2024.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment as Sheriff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {393927/1 Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 9:00 a.m. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB966 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
dependents
Law Enforcement
Notices
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Sheriffs
Spouses
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
dependents
Law Enforcement
Notices
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Sheriffs
Spouses
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 26 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |