MD SB705 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain public agencies from using seclusion as a behavioral health intervention for a student; prohibiting a public agency from using physical restraint and a nonpublic school from using physical restraint or seclusion as a behavioral health intervention for a student, except under certain circumstances; requiring the State Department of Education to develop an accountability system to measure compliance with regulations adopted on the use of physical restraint and seclusion; etc.
Title
Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 233424/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 233424/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733020/1 Adopted |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment {233424/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (13-31) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {433527/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {433527/1 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1255 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Subjects
Abuse
Administrative Agencies
Age
Child Abuse and Neglect
Data
Disabilities
Discipline
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Equipment
Gender
Health Occupations
Human Rights
internet
Jurisdiction
juvsvcedboard
meetings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Notices
Nurses
Physicians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Psychologists
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
Social Workers
Special Education
Students
Threats
Time
Violence
Administrative Agencies
Age
Child Abuse and Neglect
Data
Disabilities
Discipline
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Equipment
Gender
Health Occupations
Human Rights
internet
Jurisdiction
juvsvcedboard
meetings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Notices
Nurses
Physicians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Psychologists
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
Social Workers
Special Education
Students
Threats
Time
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |