MD SB702 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Baltimore County to grant a credit against the county property tax for owner-occupied residential real property within a specified proximity to a specified refuse disposal system; prohibiting the governing body of Baltimore County from granting a credit for taxable years beginning after a specified date; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2015-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-4) |
2015-04-08 | House | Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {285063/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-1) |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {233127/1 Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {569834/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |