MD SB695 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a framework for a court to oversee the management and disposition of commercial property subject to receivership; providing standards and guidelines for the appointment, authority, and termination of a receiver over receivership property; establishing duties that may be required of a receiver; establishing a procedure for the transfer of receivership property; repealing certain provisions of law regarding an assignee for the benefit of creditors; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Commercial Receivership Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-01SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {127673/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback