MD SB695 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Frederick County a beauty salon beer and wine license; requiring that a recipient of the license be a holder of a beauty salon permit; authorizing a license holder to provide beer and wine by the glass for consumption by a customer receiving cosmetology services or when a fund-raising event is held; prohibiting the license from being transferred to another location; specifying a $100 annual license fee; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {344438/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Education
Fees
Frederick County
Gifts
Licenses
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Education
Fees
Frederick County
Gifts
Licenses
Weights and Measures